Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Consiglieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491Born
15 Mar 155766.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155766.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
15 Apr 155766.2Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
16 Dec 155867.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
25 Aug 155968.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Consiglieri
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Consiglieri (born 1491, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • od/c0: CB, 28 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast