Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Aldobrandini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
26 Aug 156944.6AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
8 Dec 156944.9Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
17 May 157045.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157045.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia
20 Nov 157045.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
14 Dec 157247.9AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
9 Feb 157348.1ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
7 Sep 157348.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Aldobrandini (VIAF: 316737587)
Giovanni Cardinal Aldobrandini (born 1525, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano, Diocese of Fano
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Aldobrandini Chapel, S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 56
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018