Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Ursino (Orsino)

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1783BornCatania
23 May 180724.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 184461.1SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
25 Jul 184461.2ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
10 Nov 184461.5Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
8 Feb 186076.8DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Ursino (Orsino):
Bishop Martino Ursino (Orsino) (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,843
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 295
  • c2+: CB, 19 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014