Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Bisignani

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Aegae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1778BornMessina, Italy
19 Sep 180122.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182445.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
Jun 1824³45.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
Sep 185576.7DiedTitular Bishop of Aegae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Bisignani
Bishop Giovanni Maria Bisignani (born , died Sep 1855) Titular Bishop of Aegae

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 60
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016