Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Regano (Regnano)

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1786BornAndria
16 Jun 181024.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 183952.9SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
11 Jul 183953.1ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
1 Sep 183953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
4 Sep 185973.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Catania, Italy
30 Mar 186174.8DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Regano (Regnano):
Archbishop Felice Regano (Regnano) (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014