Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Maria Giuseppe Benedetto Placido Vincenzo Cardinal Trigona e Parisi

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1767³BornPiazza Armerina
18 Jun 179124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
3 Jul 181750.0IncardinatedPriest of Piazza Armerina, Italy
18 Jun 181851.0SelectedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
21 Dec 181851.5ConfirmedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
24 Jan 181951.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
21 Mar 183264.8SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Apr 183365.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
23 Jun 183467.0Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 183770.0DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Giuseppe Benedetto Placido Vincenzo Trigona e Parisi
Gaetano Maria Giuseppe Benedetto Placido Vincenzo Cardinal Trigona e Parisi (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,500
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126, and Page 298
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 8
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016