Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Orozco de Arce

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1562AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
11 Aug 1574AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
28 Mar 1576DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Orozco de Arce
Bishop Juan Orozco de Arce (died ) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159, and Page 307
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,292
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 73, Number 433
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,562, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast