Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Salvatore Baturi

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1964 Born
2 Jan 199328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
16 Nov 201955.6AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
5 Jan 202055.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Salvatore Baturi
Archbishop Giuseppe Salvatore Baturi (born ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained BishopNostra Signora di Bonaria, Basilica, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cagliari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2019
  • mn: CB, 15 Dec 2019
  • c2+: CB, 18 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 5 Jan 2020

Quantcast