Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Gussio

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1644AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
29 May 1644Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
22 Aug 1650AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
Jul 1660³DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Gussio
Bishop Marco Antonio Gussio (died Jul 1660) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicosie

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146, and Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 658
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1644, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018