Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Trigona

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1735BornPlata
7 Dec 176025.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 180670.9SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
18 Sep 180771.9ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
21 Dec 180772.1Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
2 Jan 182488.2DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Trigona:
Bishop Filippo Trigona (born , died ) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013