Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Daza

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1496AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
14 Feb 1498AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
16 Mar 1502AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
4 Nov 1504AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
21 May 1510DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Daza
Bishop Juan Daza (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1496, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast