Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Brunachio

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1632AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
8 Dec 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
1 Jan 1638DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Brunachio
Bishop Antonio Brunachio (died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 555
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast