Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Leonardo Mocenigo (Mozzenigo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Candia, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹Born
1622¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 163339.4AppointedArchbishop of Candia, Greece
21 Aug 163339.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Candia, Greece
1644¹50.0DiedArchbishop of Candia, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Leonardo Mocenigo (Mozzenigo)
Archbishop Luigi Leonardo Mocenigo (Mozzenigo) (born 1594, died 1644) Archbishop of Candia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCrete, Archdiocese of Candia

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 168
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 48
  • fn/ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017