Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Torresiglia (Torrecilla Manso)

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1644SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
13 Jul 1644ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
28 Jan 1648DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Torresiglia (Torrecilla Manso):
Archbishop Giovanni Torresiglia (Torrecilla Manso) (died ) Archbishop of Monreale

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 249
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013