Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pier Francesco Brunaccini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1772BornMessina
6 Jan 179522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 May 184472.2SelectedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
17 Jun 184472.3ConfirmedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
8 Sep 184472.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
12 Apr 184573.1SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
24 Nov 184573.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
14 Jun 185078.3DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Francesco Brunaccini (VIAF: 88798514)
Archbishop Pier Francesco Brunaccini O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 272, and Page 310
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016