Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico de Torres (I)

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1533Born
9 Dec 157340.0AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Dec 157340.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Dec 158350.1DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico de Torres (I)
Archbishop Ludovico de Torres (I) (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga, Diocese of Málaga, Spain
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 84, Number 508
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast