Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vitaliano Cardinal Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618²Born
11 Aug 166446.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
16 Aug 166446.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Feb 166648.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Mar 166749.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 166850.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 Mar 166951.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
2 Jun 167052.4AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
7 Sep 167153.6DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitaliano Visconti (VIAF: 89106931)
Vitaliano Cardinal Visconti (born 1618, died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Monreale, Archdiocese of Monreale

  • a cardinal for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Feb 1666
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,664, Number 44
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast