Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Sarmiento Valladares

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616²BornVigo
4 Oct 166751.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 166852.1AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
27 May 166852.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Sep 166852.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
26 Apr 167761.3ResignedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Sarmiento Valladares:
Bishop Diego Sarmiento Valladares , Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 203, Number 1,270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013