Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simón García Pedrejón, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹BornTorquemada
20 Dec 167348.0SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Mar 167448.2ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
Dec 1674²48.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
20 Apr 168256.3AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
27 Sep 169670.7DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simón García Pedrejón:
Bishop Simón García Pedrejón O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 300, and Page 394
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 211, Number 1,318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013