Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Manrique de Guzmán

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornSevilla, Spain
15 Dec 167040.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
22 Dec 167040.9AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
1671²41.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
26 Feb 167949.1DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Manrique de Guzmán:
Patriarch Antonio Manrique de Guzmán (born 1630, died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 396
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 207, Number 1,295
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015