Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Antolínez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornValladolid
6 Dec 167560.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
22 Mar 167661.2Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Jul 167762.5DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Antolínez:
Bishop Agustín Antolínez O.S.A. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,742
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 213, Number 1,329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015