Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Amati

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1625BornPistoia
29 Jul 164823.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 166944.1AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
25 Aug 166944.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
Oct 1689³64.3DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Amati:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Amati (born ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015