Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Rois y Mendoza, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1611BornMadrid
7 Apr 163524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
14 May 166857.2AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
23 Sep 166857.5Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
29 May 167362.2AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
16 Mar 167766.0DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Rois y Mendoza:
Archbishop Francisco de Rois y Mendoza O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 211, and Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,869
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 203, Number 1,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013