Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus Pedicini, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornVitulano
19 Aug 166945.6AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
25 Aug 166945.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
1 Dec 168864.9DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Pedicini:
Bishop Jacobus Pedicini C.R.M. (died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015