Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Pennisi

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1946 Born
9 Sep 197225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caltagirone, Italy
21 Apr 200255.4AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
3 Jul 200255.6Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
8 Feb 201366.2AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Pennisi
Archbishop Michele Pennisi (born ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLicodia Eubea

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monreale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,218
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Apr 2017