Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Canzonieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1907BornRagusa
15 Mar 193022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ragusa, Italy
11 Mar 195749.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
11 Mar 195749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
12 May 195749.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
30 Jul 196355.9AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
8 Jan 198375.3RetiredBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
26 Mar 199385.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Canzonieri:
Bishop Carmelo Canzonieri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013