Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Gennaro Spani

Deceased

Bishop of Minervino Murge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1706³BornCarinola
18 Dec 172822.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 175145.2AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
19 Mar 175145.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
Apr 1776³70.2DiedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Gennaro Spani:
Bishop Stefano Gennaro Spani (born , died Apr 1776) Bishop of Minervino Murge

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015