Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Sanchez de Luna

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1725Born
21 Dec 173712.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 173813.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 175529.9AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
25 Jul 175529.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
9 Apr 176438.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nola, Italy
13 May 176438.7InstalledBishop of Nola, Italy
23 Apr 176842.7DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Sanchez de Luna
Archbishop Nicola Sanchez de Luna (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313, and Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018