Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Felice del Prete

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1688BornCasalnuovo
12 Mar 171224.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 174456.3AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
26 Apr 174456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
22 Dec 175164.0DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Felice del Prete:
Bishop Filippo Felice del Prete (died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013