Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1682³BornSomma
1698¹15.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
27 Feb 170624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 Sep 174260.7AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
29 Sep 174260.7Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
4 May 174563.3DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Carafa:
Bishop Antonio Maria Carafa C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1742, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015