Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Maria Jannucci

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1700Born
18 Dec 172323.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 173939.2AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
21 Dec 173939.2Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
26 Mar 175756.4DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Maria Jannucci
Bishop Giacinto Maria Jannucci (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018