Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Cavallini

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1699³BornCingoli
29 Sep 172627.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 174444.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
22 Mar 174444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
6 Feb 176464.4DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Cavallini:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Cavallini (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015