Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Zavarroni

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1687BornMont'Alto
14 Jun 171023.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 174154.6AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
24 Sep 174154.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Jul 175972.4DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Zavarroni:
Bishop Antonio Zavarroni (born ) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013