Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Andrea Tomacelli

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1701Born
21 Mar 172220.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 174442.7AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
13 Sep 174442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
24 Aug 176664.7DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Andrea Tomacelli
Bishop Diego Andrea Tomacelli (born , died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScilla

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018