Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Mandarini

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1696BornSanta Caterina
4 Mar 171922.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Nov 171923.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 174145.0AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
9 Jul 174145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
29 Jan 174851.6AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
9 Nov 176973.4DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Mandarini:
Bishop Ferdinando Mandarini (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015