Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bufalini

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1698Born
19 Sep 172223.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 172224.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174749.2AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
21 Dec 174749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
28 Nov 174850.1DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bufalini
Bishop Giovanni Bufalini (born , died ) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallis

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018