Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Carmignani, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1702BornNapoli
1718¹15.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
Dec 1725³23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Jul 173734.8AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
14 Jul 173734.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
3 Jun 173835.7SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
24 Nov 173836.2ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
11 Aug 177067.9DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Carmignani:
Archbishop Gennaro Carmignani C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138, and Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015