Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Antonio Schiaffinati, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1672Born
19 Mar 169522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
4 May 173967.1AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
7 Jun 173967.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
15 Feb 174370.8DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Antonio Schiaffinati (VIAF: 70768175)
Bishop Nicola Antonio Schiaffinati O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • c34/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast