Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Almeida

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1690BornBadajoz, Spain
24 Apr 173544.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173545.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
2 Oct 173545.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Almeida:
Archbishop Cristóbal Almeida (born ) Titular Archbishop of Perge

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015