Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Lodovico Paparelli

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1690BornAscoli Piceno
16 Mar 171524.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 174453.7AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
13 Sep 174453.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
7 Oct 175463.8DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Lodovico Paparelli:
Bishop Silvestro Lodovico Paparelli (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013