Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione de’ Lorenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1694Born
17 Dec 171824.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 174753.4AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
26 Nov 174753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
24 Jun 177277.9DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Scipione de’ Lorenzi
Bishop Scipione de’ Lorenzi (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,747, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast