Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Lorenzi (de Laurentiis)

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1701BornNapoli
23 Dec 172423.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174342.1AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
21 Jul 174342.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
1785¹83.5DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Lorenzi (de Laurentiis):
Bishop Girolamo Lorenzi (de Laurentiis) (born , died 1785) Bishop of Acerno

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015