Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix de Pa¨

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1703Born
24 Sep 174643.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 175147.6SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
15 Mar 175147.8ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
19 Mar 175147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
6 Nov 178279.4DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felix de Pa¨
Bishop Felix de Pa¨ (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerlizzi

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1751, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast