Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Iorio (Jorio)

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1686BornProcida
4 Apr 171023.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 173852.0AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
30 Nov 173852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
15 Aug 175467.7DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Iorio (Jorio):
Bishop Francesco Iorio (Jorio) (died ) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013