Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Scarselli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Mennith


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1740AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
23 Sep 1740AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
2 Oct 1740Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
30 Jun 1743DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Scarselli
Bishop Giovanni Battista Scarselli (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286, and Page 451
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018