Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Mateo López Sáenz, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1687³BornAgreda
9 Jul 174255.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
15 Jul 174255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
14 Oct 175265.3DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Mateo López Sáenz:
Bishop Juan Mateo López Sáenz C.R.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015