Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Marulli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1677BornBarletta
25 Jul 170022.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 174567.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
27 Jun 174567.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Nov 1751³74.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Marulli:
Archbishop Antonio Marulli (born , died Nov 1751) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015