Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Punnakottil

Bishop Emeritus of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1936 BornThazhuvamkunnu
18 Oct 196125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India
26 Feb 197740.5AppointedBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 Apr 197740.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India
10 Jan 201376.3RetiredBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for George Punnakottil:
Bishop George Punnakottil (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kothamangalam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Aug 2014