Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathew Anikuzhikattil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1942Born
15 Mar 197128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Jan 200360.3AppointedBishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India
2 Mar 200360.4Ordained BishopBishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Jan 201875.3RetiredBishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India
1 May 202077.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Mathew Anikuzhikattil (VIAF: 55920355)
Bishop Mathew Anikuzhikattil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Idukki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKunchithanny
Ordained BishopIn front of, St. George, Cathedral, Vazhathope
Death PlaceKolenchery

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,342
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 30 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 2 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 May 2020

Quantcast