Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Nellikunnel

Bishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1973 Born
30 Dec 199825.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 201844.8AppointedBishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India
5 Apr 201845.0Ordained BishopBishop of Idukki (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for John Nellikunnel
Bishop John Nellikunnel (born ) Bishop of Idukki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKadaplamattom, Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopSt. George's, Cathedral, Vazhathope, Eparchy of Idukki (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Idukki (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 12 Jan 2018
  • c2+: CB, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast